+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Passed
- Amendment Tabled
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 15, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (2)
March 1, 2018: Passed (Senate)
February 8, 2018: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor