+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 30, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 29, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Clarke,Jackson (32nd),Frazier
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Conferees Named Frierson,Huddleston (15th),Mims
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Appropriations
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Passed
- Amendment Failed
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations
+ − Votes (4)
March 30, 2014: Conference Report Adopted (House)
March 30, 2014: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 14, 2014: Passed As Amended (Senate)
February 19, 2014: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor