+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
- Returned For Enrolling
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local and Private
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Immediate Release
- Passed
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Referred To Local and Private Legislation