+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Died In Conference
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Fillingane,Kirby,Whaley
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Conferees Named Smith,Lamar,Hood
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Henley, Smith, Lamar)
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Passed
- Amendment Failed
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means