+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division A;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Passed
- Reconsidered
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Holland, Smith, Lamar)
- Failed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
February 2, 2017: Passed (House)
February 1, 2017: Failed (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor