+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On May 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Evans (91st), Boyd, Criswell)
- Passed
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
+ − Vote
March 5, 2020: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor