+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Immediate Release
- Passed
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local and Private
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Passed
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred To Local and Private Legislation