+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division A
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Passed
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary A
+ − Statutes Amended (30)
- 091-0008-0105 -
- 027-0010-0001 -
- 027-0010-0003 -
- 027-0010-0005 -
- 027-0010-0007 -
- 027-0010-0009 -
- 027-0010-0011 -
- 027-0010-0013 -
- 027-0010-0015 -
- 027-0010-0017 -
- 027-0010-0019 -
- 027-0010-0021 -
- 027-0010-0023 -
- 027-0010-0025 -
- 089-0021-0001 -
- 089-0021-0003 -
- 089-0021-0005 -
- 089-0021-0007 -
- 089-0021-0009 -
- 089-0021-0011 -
- 089-0021-0013 -
- 089-0021-0015 -
- 089-0021-0017 -
- 091-0009-0501 -
- 091-0009-0503 -
- 091-0009-0505 -
- 091-0009-0507 -
- 091-0009-0509 -
- 091-0009-0511 -
- 091-0007-0259 -
+ − Vote
February 12, 2019: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor