+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Died On Calendar
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Appropriations
On February 4, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Passed
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 17, 2022 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
February 3, 2022: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor