+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local and Private
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Passed
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Referred To Local and Private Legislation