+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Universities and Colleges;Appropriations
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Passed
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
- DR - TSDP: AP To UC
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- DR - TSDP: UC To AP
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Universities and Colleges;Appropriations