+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered
- Passed
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Straughter, Carpenter)
- Motion to Reconsider W/Drawn
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Evans (91st), Carpenter, Straughter)
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Fees and Salaries of Public Officers
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (2)
March 11, 2014: Passed (Senate)
February 11, 2014: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Gunn
Type:
Primary Sponsor