+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Passed
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred To Education
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
February 12, 2019: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor