+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On May 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division B
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Reconsidered
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Tullos, Bain, Sanford)
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary B
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
+ − Votes (2)
March 12, 2020: Passed As Amended (House)
March 11, 2020: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor