+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division A
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary B