+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
- Recommitted For Further Conf
- Reconsidered
On March 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommitted For Further Conf
On March 28, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Hopson,Norwood,Wiggins
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Conferees Named Read,White,Watson
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Appropriations
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Immediate Release
- Passed
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations
+ − Votes (4)
March 29, 2021: Conference Report Adopted (House)
March 29, 2021: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 16, 2021: Passed As Amended (Senate)
February 23, 2021: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor