+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Reconsidered
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Smith, Lamar)
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
+ − Statutes Amended (14)
+ − Votes (2)
February 25, 2016: Passed As Amended (House)
February 24, 2016: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor