+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Concurred in Amend From Senate
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Appropriations
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Immediate Release
- Passed
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations
+ − Votes (3)
March 18, 2021: Concurred in Amend From Senate (House)
March 16, 2021: Passed As Amended (Senate)
February 23, 2021: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor