+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Elections
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Passed
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Apportionment and Elections
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
+ − Votes (2)
March 24, 2016: Passed (Senate)
March 1, 2016: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor