+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Died In Conference
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Fillingane,Kirby,Chassaniol
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Conferees Named Busby,Steverson,Massengill
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Passed
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred To Transportation