+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Harkins,Sparks,Blount
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Conferees Named Boyd,Criswell,Robinson
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Passed
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 8, 2021 in the House:
- Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
+ − Votes (4)
March 28, 2021: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 27, 2021: Conference Report Adopted (House)
March 10, 2021: Passed As Amended (Senate)
February 4, 2021: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor