+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Passed
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 15, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
March 1, 2018: Passed (Senate)
January 31, 2018: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor