+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Public Health and Welfare;Appropriations
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 15, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Public Property
+ − Vote
February 1, 2018: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor