+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Tabled
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Passed
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
+ − Votes (2)
March 16, 2021: Passed As Amended (Senate)
February 24, 2021: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor