+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered
- Passed
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local and Private
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Barton, Gibbs (36th), Smith)
- Passed
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred To Local and Private Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
March 25, 2021: Passed (Senate)
February 25, 2021: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor