+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 30, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Simmons (13th),Fillingane,Butler (38th)
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Conferees Named Johnson,Massengill,DeLano
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDPAA: HI To FI
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Highways and Transportation;Finance
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (4)
April 2, 2013: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
April 1, 2013: Conference Report Adopted (House)
March 7, 2013: Passed As Amended (Senate)
February 13, 2013: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor