+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Ports and Marine Resources
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 17, 2022 in the House:
- Referred To Marine Resources
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Vote
February 10, 2022: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor