+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 4, 2025 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 14, 2025 in the Senate:
- Referred To Gaming
On February 4, 2025 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 3, 2025 in the House:
- Committee Substitute Adopted
- Passed
On January 29, 2025 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 20, 2025 in the House:
- Referred To Gaming
+ − Statutes Amended (32)
- 097-0033-0017
- 075-0076-0005
- 075-0076-0033
- 075-0076-0089
- 075-0076-0091
- 075-0076-0129
- 075-0076-0203
- 075-0076-0205
- 075-0076-0211
- 075-0076-0055
- 075-0076-0079
- 075-0076-0101
- 075-0076-0175
- 075-0076-0177
- 097-0033-0305
- 097-0033-0027
- 097-0033-0008
- 097-0033-0025
- 097-0033-0001
- 097-0033-0007
- 007-0011-0011
- 029-0001-0107
- 029-0015-0001
- 029-0015-0003
- 029-0015-0005
- 029-0015-0009
- 029-0015-0010
- 029-0015-0013
- 059-0007-0405
- 059-0015-0001
- 075-0076-0067
- 087-0001-0005
+ − Vote
February 3, 2025: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor