+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency;Highways and Transportation
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Passed
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Vote
February 12, 2014: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor