+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Immediate Release
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 18, 2021 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 2021: Passed (Senate)
February 3, 2021: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor