+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Paden, Bennett, Roberson)
- Concurred in Amend From Senate
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDP: ED To AP
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education;Appropriations
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred To Education