+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On July 7, 2020 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On June 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On June 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On June 25, 2020 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On June 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On June 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Fillingane,Parks,Whaley
On June 22, 2020 in the House:
- Conferees Named Busby,Arnold,Crudup
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On June 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On June 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On May 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On May 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Highways and Transportation
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
- DR - TSDPCS: AP To TR
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- DR - TSDPCS: TR To AP
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Transportation;Appropriations
+ − Votes (4)
June 26, 2020: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
June 25, 2020: Conference Report Adopted (House)
June 10, 2020: Passed As Amended (Senate)
March 5, 2020: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor