+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDP: IN To FI
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Insurance;Finance
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Passed
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Insurance
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
February 6, 2014: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor