+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Died On Calendar
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
- DR - TSDPAA: HI To JB
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Highways and Transportation;Judiciary, Division B
On February 4, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 4, 2022 in the House:
- Referred To Transportation