+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Public Property
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Public Property
+ − Votes (2)
March 7, 2013: Passed (Senate)
February 7, 2013: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor