+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On May 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education;Appropriations
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Passed
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
- DR - TSDP: AP To ED
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- DR - TSDP: ED To AP
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Education;Appropriations
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
March 5, 2020: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor