+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Fillingane,Kirby,Carter
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Conferees Named Byrd,Bennett,Reynolds
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred To County Affairs