+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
- Motion to Recnsdr Tabled Lost
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Evans (91st), Bennett, Roberson)
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
- Conferees Named Harkins,Tollison,Polk
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Conferees Named Bennett,Roberson,DeLano
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Universities and Colleges
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Passed
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
- Rereferred To Education
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred To Universities and Colleges
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 28, 2019: Conference Report Adopted (House)
March 28, 2019: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 7, 2019: Passed As Amended (Senate)
February 12, 2019: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor