+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Agriculture
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Reconsidered
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Brown (66th), Sullivan, Pigott, Frierson)
- Passed
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
- DR - TSDP: AP To AG
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- DR - TSDP: AG To AP
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Agriculture;Appropriations
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (3)
March 5, 2014: Passed (Senate)
February 12, 2014: Passed As Amended (House)
February 6, 2014: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor