+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Point of Order-Not Well Taken
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Set Aside-Pend Ruling of Chair
- Point of Order Raised
- Amended
- Point of Order-Not Well Taken
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Set Aside-Pend Ruling of Chair
- Point of Order Raised
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 15, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary A