+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On May 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Economic and Workforce Development;Judiciary, Division B
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary B
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
March 11, 2020: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor