+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Died On Calendar
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
- DR - TSDP: WM To TO
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- DR - TSDP: TO To WM
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Tourism;Ways and Means
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor