+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred To Banking and Financial Services
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
February 13, 2019: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor