+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On May 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Passed
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Vote
March 12, 2020: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor