+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Public Health and Welfare
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Passed
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred To Public Health and Human Services