+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred To Education