+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Veterans and Military Affairs
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 19, 2015 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary B