+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Snowden, Smith, Lamar)
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 15, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
+ − Statutes Amended (20)
- 027-0035-0301 -
- 027-0035-0303 -
- 027-0035-0305 -
- 027-0035-0307 -
- 027-0035-0309 -
- 027-0035-0310 -
- 027-0035-0311 -
- 027-0035-0313 -
- 027-0035-0315 -
- 027-0035-0319 -
- 027-0035-0321 -
- 027-0035-0325 -
- 027-0035-0327 -
- 027-0035-0331 -
- 027-0035-0333 -
- 027-0035-0335 -
- 027-0035-0337 -
- 027-0035-0339 -
- 027-0035-0341 -
- 027-0035-0343 -
+ − Vote
January 31, 2018: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Snowden
Type:
Primary Sponsor