+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Bryan,Blackwell,Harkins
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Conferees Named Bain,Steverson,Barnett
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reconsidered
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Public Health and Welfare
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Passed
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 8, 2021 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary B
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (4)
March 30, 2021: Conference Report Adopted (House)
March 30, 2021: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 11, 2021: Passed As Amended (Senate)
February 4, 2021: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor