+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Education